WV HCR61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - Midnight hour arrived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - Midnight hour arrived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this resolution is to apply to and urge Congress call a convention of the states, under the authority reserved to the states in Article V of the United States Constitution, limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States, and limit the terms of office for persons elected to the United States House of Representatives or to the United States Senate.
Title
Applying to and urging Congress to call a convention of the states to limit the terms of office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 651) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Postponed to a date certain rejected (Roll No. 650) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Postponed to a date certain rejected (Roll No. 650) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Midnight hour arrived |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 651) |
2019-03-08 | House | Postponed to a date certain rejected (Roll No. 650) |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-08 | House | Placed at foot of all bills |
2019-03-08 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |