WV HCR74 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army PFC James Leslie Pridemore Memorial Road
Title
U. S. Army PFC James Leslie Pridemore Memorial Road
Sponsors
Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] | Del. Anthony Paynter [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2019-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-01 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-02-18 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-18 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |