WV HCR9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Kingmont Veterans Bridge PVT Jarrett Springer, U. S. Army WWII, PFC Benjamin "Benny" Hamrick, USMC Vietnam
Title
Kingmont Veterans Bridge PVT Jarrett Springer, U. S. Army WWII, PFC Benjamin "Benny" Hamrick, USMC Vietnam
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-17 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |