WV SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Second Chance Driver's License Program
Title
Relating to Second Chance Driver's License Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-17 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |