WV SB1039 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - To House Select Committee on Education Reform C
Pending: House Select Committee on Education C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - To House Select Committee on Education Reform C
Pending: House Select Committee on Education C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the Student Success Act.
Title
Establishing Student Success Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - House - Motion to lay upon the table the motion to refuse to recieve message adopted (Roll No. 819) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 64) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 63) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Trump Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 62) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Constitutional rule suspension rejected (Roll No. 58) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 64) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 63) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Trump Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 62) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Constitutional rule suspension rejected (Roll No. 58) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | House | To House Select Committee on Education Reform C |
2019-06-17 | House | To Select Committee on Education Reform C |
2019-06-17 | House | Motion to lay upon the table the motion to refuse to recieve message adopted (Roll No. 819) |
2019-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 64) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 63) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Hamilton Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rucker Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Tarr Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Weld Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Trump Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 62) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Constitutional rule suspension rejected (Roll No. 58) |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 1B | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 1 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2E | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 2I | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 16a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 18a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 18b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 45a | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5E | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5E | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5E | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5E | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 7A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 8 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9B | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18A | 4 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 12 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |