WV SB105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating enhanced penalty for certain aggravated traffic offenses
Title
Creating offense of impaired operation of motor vehicle placing nonpassengers at risk of physical injury
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 261) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 261) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2822 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 2c | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |