WV SB116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing court costs collected under Second Chance Driver's License Program are not subject to 5 percent offset
Title
Providing court costs collected under Second Chance Driver's License Program are not subject to 5 percent offset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2018-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2018-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |