WV SB124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating felony offense for actions of cruelty to animals which causes serious injury or death of animal
Title
Creating felony offense for actions of cruelty to animals which causes serious injury or death of animal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |