WV SB16 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 266, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing expenditure of surplus funds by Wyoming County Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing expenditure of surplus funds by Wyoming County Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 578) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 92) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 266, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 578)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-02-11HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-11HouseTo Finance
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-08SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-08SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 92)
2019-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-05SenateReported do pass
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback