WV SB16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 339, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 339, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Protect Our Right to Unite Act
Title
Creating Protect Our Right to Unite Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 157) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 157) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 339, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/2/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/20 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 166) |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-12 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 157) |
2020-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 7 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 7 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 7 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 7 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |