WV SB163 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal or county taxation of hotel rooms booked through marketplace facilitator
Title
Relating to municipal or county taxation of hotel rooms booked through marketplace facilitator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 416) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 448) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 448) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 416) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 448) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-21 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-21 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4555 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 18 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |