WV SB177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Fire Commission rule relating to State Building Code
Title
Fire Commission rule relating to State Building Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 53) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 53) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | Approved by Governor 2/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/14/19 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Governor 2/8/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-11 | House | To Governor 2/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Governor 2/8/19 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) |
2019-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 53) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2240 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |