WV SB187 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State Tax Department rule relating to exchange of information agreements between State Tax Division and certain state agencies
Title
Authorizing Department of Revenue to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 486) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 485) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 485) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 486) |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 485) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | To Finance then Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Finance then Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2270 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |