WV SB193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 154, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 154, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing deadlines for spending units to submit certain procurements
Title
Setting forth timeframes for continuing purchases of commodities and services over $1 million
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 608) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 635) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 635) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 154, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 608) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 635) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |