WV SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Improving ability of law enforcement to locate and return missing persons
Title
Improving ability of law enforcement to locate and return missing persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 452) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 452) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 3C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3C | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |