WV SB238 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignating Division of Veterans' Affairs as Department of Veteran's Assistance
Title
Redesignating Division of Veterans' Affairs as Department of Veterans' Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-18 - House - Override Veto (Y: 76 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Override Veto (Y: 76 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/29/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/29/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-29 | Approved by Governor 3/29/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-18 | House Message received | |
2011-03-18 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-18 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 503) | |
2011-03-18 | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 502) | |
2011-03-18 | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-18 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-18 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-18 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-03-18 | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-03-18 | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/18/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/17/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/17/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/11 | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 68) | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 68) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 447) | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 446) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Placed at foot of bills on third reading | |
2011-03-12 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-02-23 | To House Government Organization | |
2011-02-23 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-23 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-23 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-02-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-23 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-22 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-18 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-11 | To Finance | |
2011-02-11 | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance | |
2011-01-21 | To Military | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-21 | To Military then Finance | |
2011-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2761 (Same As) 2011-02-10 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6 | 7 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
9A | 1 | 1b | New Code | See Bill Text |
9A | 1 | 1c | New Code | See Bill Text |
9A | 1 | 1d | New Code | See Bill Text |
9A | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |