WV SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing certain legislative rules no longer authorized or are obsolete
Title
Repealing certain legislative rules no longer authorized or are obsolete
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 102) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 102) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 100) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 99) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 102) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 100) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 99) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Governor 2/15/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-18 | House | To Governor 2/15/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Governor 2/15/19 |
2019-02-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 102) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 102) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 100) |
2019-02-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 99) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-08 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2019-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendments pending |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/7/19 |
2019-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 18) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |