WV SB249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to administration of estates and trusts
Title
Relating to administration of estates and trusts
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 241) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 241) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |