WV SB253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Protecting consumers from automatic purchase renewal and continuous service offers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting consumers from automatic purchase renewal and continuous service offers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-25SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 26)
2019-01-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-24SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/24/19
2019-01-24SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-22SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-11SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-11SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
46A6N1New CodeSee Bill Text
46A6N2New CodeSee Bill Text
46A6N3New CodeSee Bill Text
46A6N4New CodeSee Bill Text
46A6N5New CodeSee Bill Text
46A6N6New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback