WV SB266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Intermediate Court of Appeals and WV Appellate Review Organization Act of 2019
Title
Creating Intermediate Court of Appeals and WV Appellate Review Organization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 148) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-19 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 148) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/14/19 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2366 (Similar To) 2019-01-14 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29A | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29A | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 11 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 2A | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 9 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
58 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |