WV SB267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing salaries of certain state employees
Title
Increasing salaries of certain state employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 177) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 176) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 175) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 166) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 166) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Amendment to House amendment adopted (Roll No. 165) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Motion to discharge bill from committee rejected (Roll No. 136) (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 91) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 90) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 87) (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 55) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Prezioso Floor amendment 2 rejected (Roll No. 52) (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Prezioso Floor amendments 1 rejected (Roll No. 51) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 176) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 175) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 166) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 166) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Amendment to House amendment adopted (Roll No. 165) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Motion to discharge bill from committee rejected (Roll No. 136) (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 91) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 90) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 87) (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 55) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Prezioso Floor amendment 2 rejected (Roll No. 52) (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Prezioso Floor amendments 1 rejected (Roll No. 51) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | House | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 |
2018-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Governor 2/21/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 177) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 176) |
2018-02-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 175) |
2018-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 166) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 166) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Amendment to House amendment adopted (Roll No. 165) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment to House amendment |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Motion to discharge bill from committee rejected (Roll No. 136) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-02-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 91) |
2018-02-13 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 90) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 87) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | To Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 55) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Prezioso Floor amendment 2 rejected (Roll No. 52) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Prezioso Floor amendments 1 rejected (Roll No. 51) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/31/18 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/30/18 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4145 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |