WV SB272 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Updating code relating to Commission on Special Investigations
Title
Updating code relating to Commission on Special Investigations
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 246) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 245) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 170) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 37) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 245) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 170) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 37) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/28/19 |
2019-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-22 | House | Effective ninety days from passage |
2019-02-22 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Governor 2/22/19 |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 246) |
2019-02-21 | House | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 245) |
2019-02-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2019-02-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 170) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | House | Vetoed by Governor 2/11/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 2/11/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 2/11/19 |
2019-02-06 | House | To Governor 2/5/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Governor 2/5/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Governor 2/5/19 |
2019-02-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) |
2019-01-29 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 37) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 5 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |