WV SB279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring dental insurance plans honor assignment made in writing by person covered
Title
Requiring dental insurance plans honor assignment made in writing by person covered
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2020-02-18 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4171 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 16 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |