WV SB298 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing county assessors make separate entries in landbooks when real property is partly used for exempt and partly for nonexempt purposes
Title
Authorizing county assessors make separate entries in landbooks when real property is partly used for exempt and partly for nonexempt purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 390) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 390) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 340) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2018-01-22 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-22 | House | To Finance |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB4256 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |