WV SB313 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Waiving occupational fees and licensing requirements for certain low-income individuals, military families, and young workers
Title
Waiving occupational fees and licensing requirements for certain low-income individuals, military families, and young workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 565) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 564) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 563) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 492) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 448) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 447) (Y: 43 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 187) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 564) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 563) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 492) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 448) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 447) (Y: 43 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 187) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 565) |
2018-03-10 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 564) |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 563) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 492) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 448) |
2018-03-09 | House | Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 447) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 187) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |