WV SB317 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 176, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing three or more adjacent counties form multicounty trail network authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing three or more adjacent counties form multicounty trail network authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 747) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 547) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 518) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 176, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 747)
2019-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 547)
2019-03-09HouseConference report filed - House
2019-03-09SenateConference report filed - Senate
2019-03-09SenateTo conference
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Maynard, Smith, Beach
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseHouse appointed conferees: Howell, Hott, Hansen
2019-03-08HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2019-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-08SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 518)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-03-01HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-03-01House2nd reference to the committee on Judiciary dispensed, new 2nd reference, to Government Organization
2019-03-01HouseDo pass
2019-02-12HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-12HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-11SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 105)
2019-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-01-22SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-16SenateTo Natural Resources
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-16SenateTo Natural Resources then Judiciary
2019-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2014A1New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A10New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A11New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A12New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A2New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A3New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A4New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A5New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A6New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A7New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A8New CodeSee Bill Text
2014A9New CodeSee Bill Text
20171New CodeSee Bill Text
201710New CodeSee Bill Text
20172New CodeSee Bill Text
20173New CodeSee Bill Text
20174New CodeSee Bill Text
20175New CodeSee Bill Text
20176New CodeSee Bill Text
20177New CodeSee Bill Text
20178New CodeSee Bill Text
20179New CodeSee Bill Text
2017A1New CodeSee Bill Text
2017A2New CodeSee Bill Text
2017A3New CodeSee Bill Text
2017A4New CodeSee Bill Text
2017A5New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=317&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=317
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-11-0105.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00518.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0547.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00747.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback