WV SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring Medicaid Fraud Control Unit to Attorney General's office
Title
Transferring Medicaid Fraud Control Unit to Attorney General's office
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 521) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 rejected (Roll No. 520) (Y: 40 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 519) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 496) (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 262) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 rejected (Roll No. 520) (Y: 40 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 519) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 496) (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 262) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 521) |
2019-03-07 | House | Effective July 1, 2021 rejected (Roll No. 520) |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 519) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 496) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 262) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2867 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |