WV SB324 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to Commissioner of Agriculture employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Commissioner of Agriculture employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 90) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-02-20HouseApproved by Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal
2019-02-20SenateApproved by Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-19SenateApproved by Governor 2/19/19
2019-02-18SenateTo Governor 2/15/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-18HouseTo Governor 2/15/19 - House Journal
2019-02-15SenateTo Governor 2/15/19
2019-02-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-02-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-07HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 90)
2019-02-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 89)
2019-02-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-05HouseImmediate consideration
2019-02-05HouseReference dispensed
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-04SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-04SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 68)
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 68)
2019-02-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-04SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-01SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-31SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-31SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-30SenateReported do pass
2019-01-16SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-16SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2528 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
HB2624 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1913Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback