WV SB326 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reorganizing state agencies involved in emergency and disaster planning
Title
Reorganizing state agencies involved in emergency and disaster planning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 263) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-28 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 263) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2482 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1J | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 1J | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 15a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |