WV SB343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to review and approval of state property leases
Title
Relating to review and approval of state property leases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/6/19 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/5/19 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2601 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Chapter 125, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 10 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |