WV SB344 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Recommitted to Finance on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Recommitted to Finance on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring meeting of certain county board of education officials belonging to same regional educational service agency
Title
Relating to regional meetings among certain county boards of education officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance on 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 4/1/13 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Motion |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-21 | Senate | To Education |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | To Education |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2940 (Similar To) 2013-05-15 - Chapter 59, Acts, 2013