WV SB344 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish adequate and reasonable amounts of compensatory and punitive damages that may be awarded in statutory and common law wrongful or retaliatory discharge and other employment law claims or causes of action.
Title
Relating to duty to mitigate damages in employment claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 417) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 417) |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7E | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7E | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7E | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |