WV SB344 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate conflicting provisions within current code relating to the application of payments and the assessment of delinquency fees on consumer credit sales and consumer loans. The bill also permits a lender to hold a partial or nonconforming payment in suspense until such time as a full payment can be applied.
Title
Relating to application of payments on consumer credit sale and loans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 357) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 351) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 351) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 357) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 351) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-17 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 2 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 3 | 111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 3 | 112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 3 | 113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |