WV SB344 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to operation of state-owned farms
Title
Relating to operation of state-owned farms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 185) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 185) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 185) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 185) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 455) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-21 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-21 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 185) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 185) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/20/19 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2560 (Similar To) 2019-01-21 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 12A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |