WV SB359 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Senator Swope requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Senator Swope requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Youth Mental Health Protection Act
Title
Creating Youth Mental Health Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Swope requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senator Hardesty requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Cline requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |