WV SB377 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to minimum wage and maximum hour standards
Title
Relating to minimum wage and maximum hour standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 168) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 198) (Y: 44 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 197) (Y: 44 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 196) (Y: 46 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 74) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 198) (Y: 44 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 197) (Y: 44 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 196) (Y: 46 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 74) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/19 |
2019-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 168) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 204) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 198) |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 197) |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 196) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/18/19 |
2019-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/15/19 |
2019-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 74) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5C | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |