WV SB387 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Governor seek return of fugitives found in other states or District of Columbia
Title
Relating generally to extradition
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 222) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 85) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 85) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/19 |
2019-03-01 | House | To Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 222) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 85) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2757 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 1 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
61 | 14A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 14A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |