WV SB402 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Division of Forestry investigate and enforce timber theft violations
Title
Authorizing Division of Forestry investigate and enforce timber theft violations
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 524) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 669) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 425) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 524) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 669) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 425) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 524) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 524) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 669) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 425) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 524) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-21 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-21 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-23 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2717 (Similar To) 2019-01-29 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1A | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 3 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |