WV SB414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Protect Our Right to Unite Act
Title
Creating Protect Our Right to Unite Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 267) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 267) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 7 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 7 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 7 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 7 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |