WV SB415 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Timber Cotenancy Modernization and Majority Protection Act and Unknown and Unlocatable Timber Interest Owners Act
Title
Creating Timber Cotenancy Modernization and Majority Protection Act and Unknown and Unlocatable Timber Interest Owners Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 201) (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 200) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 199) (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 200) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 199) (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 201) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 200) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 199) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37D | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 1 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 1 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37D | 2 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |