WV SB432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacting Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact
Title
Enacting Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 218) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-26 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 218) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2729 (Similar To) 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 56 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |