WV SB447 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide that nonstate retired employees who have worked for their last nonstate employer for less than five years are responsible for their entire premium cost for coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing certain nonstate retirees responsible for PEIA costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-02 To House Banking and Insurance
2010-03-02 To Banking and Insurance then Finance
2010-03-02 Introduced in House
2010-03-01 Ordered to House
2010-03-01 Effective July 1, 2010 (Roll No. 3)
2010-03-01 Passed Senate (Roll No. 3)
2010-03-01 Read 3rd time
2010-03-01 On 3rd reading
2010-02-26 Read 2nd time
2010-02-26 On 2nd reading
2010-02-25 Read 1st time
2010-02-25 On 1st reading
2010-02-24 Reported do pass
2010-02-18 To Finance
2010-02-18 Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2010-02-02 To Government Organization
2010-02-02 To Government Organization then Finance
2010-02-02 Introduced in Senate
2010-02-02 To Government Organization then Finance
2010-02-02 Filed for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4299 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - Effective Date

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51622Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback