WV SB447 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to violations of school attendance requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to violations of school attendance requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 To House Education
2011-03-03 To Education then Judiciary
2011-03-03 Introduced in House
2011-03-02 Ordered to House
2011-03-02 Passed Senate (Roll No. 15)
2011-03-02 Read 3rd time
2011-03-02 On 3rd reading
2011-03-01 Read 2nd time
2011-03-01 On 2nd reading
2011-02-28 Read 1st time
2011-02-28 On 1st reading
2011-02-25 Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
2011-02-23 On 2nd reading to Judiciary
2011-02-23 Read 1st time
2011-02-23 On 1st reading
2011-02-23 Immediate consideration
2011-02-23 Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2011-02-07 To Education
2011-02-07 Introduced in Senate
2011-02-07 To Education then Judiciary
2011-02-07 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18812New CodeSee Bill Text
1882Amended CodeCitation Text
1882aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback