WV SB447 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize an additional circuit court judge for the thirtieth judicial circuit consisting of Mingo county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing additional circuit court judge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-29SenateTo Judiciary
2014-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-01-29SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2014-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4140 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - To House Judiciary
HB2310 (Similar To) 2014-01-09 - To House Judiciary
HB4205 (Similar To) 2014-01-16 - To House Judiciary
SB475 (Similar To) 2014-02-03 - To Judiciary
SB557 (Similar To) 2014-02-12 - To Judiciary
HB4509 (Similar To) 2014-02-13 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5121Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback