WV SB447 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize a person who administers a program of secondary education at a public, private or home school to issue a diploma or other appropriate credential to a person who has completed the program of secondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing issuance of diploma by public, private or home school administrator

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 45) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 590) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15SenateChapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
2015-03-18HouseApproved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal
2015-03-18SenateApproved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal
2015-04-02SenateApproved by Governor 4/2/15
2015-03-18HouseTo Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal
2015-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal
2015-03-27SenateTo Governor 3/27/15
2015-03-14HouseHouse received Senate message
2015-03-14SenateCompleted legislative action
2015-03-14SenateCommunicated to House
2015-03-14SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 45)
2015-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
2015-03-14SenateHouse Message received
2015-03-14HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-03-14HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-14HousePassed House (Roll No. 590)
2015-03-14HouseRead 3rd time
2015-03-14HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2015-03-13HouseRead 2nd time
2015-03-13HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2015-03-12HouseRead 1st time
2015-03-12HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2015-03-11HouseWith amendment, do pass
2015-03-03HouseTo House Education
2015-03-03HouseTo Education
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced in House
2015-03-02SenateOrdered to House
2015-03-02SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 13)
2015-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-02SenateOn 3rd reading
2015-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-01SenateOn 2nd reading
2015-02-28SenateRead 1st time
2015-02-28SenateOn 1st reading
2015-02-27SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2015-02-27SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2015-02-10SenateTo Education
2015-02-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2015-02-10SenateTo Education then Judiciary
2015-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18812New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback