WV SB462 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions & Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions & Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing contributon holiday for public pension plans funded at 130 percent or more
Title
Establishing contribution holiday for public pension plans funded at 130 percent or more
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2018-02-07 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Originating in Senate Pensions |
Same As/Similar To
HB4539 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |