WV SB474 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - To House Industry and Labor
Pending: House Industry and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - To House Industry and Labor
Pending: House Industry and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that certain documents filed pursuant to WV Jobs Act which include records of wages be considered confidential
Title
Requiring that certain documents filed pursuant to WV Jobs Act which include records of wages be considered confidential
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 169) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2018-02-23 | House | To Industry and Labor then Judiciary |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 169) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Workforce |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Workforce then Government Organization |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 22 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |