WV SB493 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to WV Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act
Title
Relating to guaranty associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 349) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 349) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-26 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-26 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 26A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26B | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |