WV SB514 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB514

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating WV FinTech Regulatory Sandbox Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating WV FinTech Regulatory Sandbox Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 254) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-26HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 254)
2020-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-24SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-20SenateCommittee substitute reported
2020-01-16SenateTo Economic Development
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-16SenateTo Economic Development
2020-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB514 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - To Judiciary
HB4621 (Similar To) 2020-03-07 - Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31A8G1New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G2New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G3New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G4New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G5New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G6New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G7New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G8New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback