WV SB518 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting sale and trade of dextromethorphan
Title
Restricting sale and trade of dextromethorphan
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 319) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 400) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 142) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 400) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 142) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 319) |
2019-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 400) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2019-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 142) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |